Refine your search

Showing 15 of 15 total for All Actions, Including Floor Amendments.
Date Chamber All Actions, Including Floor Amendments
11/17/2014 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 600.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: Senate
11/17/2014 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-275.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
09/17/2014 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
05/12/2014 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
05/08/2014-7:12pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3988-3999)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2014-6:55pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4366.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2014-6:55pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3988-4001)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2014-6:54pm House Mr. Rokita moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
04/29/2014 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 313.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
04/29/2014 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 113-424.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Education and the Workforce
04/08/2014 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Education and the Workforce
04/08/2014 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Education and the Workforce
04/02/2014 House Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
04/02/2014 House Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
04/02/2014 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives