Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/29/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 01/29/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 01/29/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/29/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/05/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/05/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/05/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 02/05/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 03/04/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/04/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 03/04/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/04/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/04/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/15/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/11/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/11/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/11/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/11/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/06/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/11/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/18/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 05/06/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/20/2014