Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 04/02/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/09/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/09/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/09/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/09/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/09/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 04/09/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/06/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/08/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 08/01/2014