Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 04/03/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 05/01/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/07/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/08/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/08/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/08/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/08/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/19/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/20/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 05/21/2014
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 05/27/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/27/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/27/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/27/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/27/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/27/2014
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 05/27/2014
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 05/27/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/27/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/27/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/29/2014
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/29/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/29/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/29/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/29/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/30/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/09/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/09/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/11/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/11/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/23/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/23/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/25/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/18/2014