Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/04/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/28/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/28/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/29/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/29/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/07/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/21/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/21/2014
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 05/27/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 07/14/2014