Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/29/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/07/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/07/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/08/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/08/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/13/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/13/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/13/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/13/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/20/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/21/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/21/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/21/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/21/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/21/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/21/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/23/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/23/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/23/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 05/23/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/29/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/29/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/29/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/29/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/29/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/29/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/09/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/17/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/17/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/17/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/17/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 06/19/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/19/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/19/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/19/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/08/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/08/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/08/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/10/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 11/14/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/03/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/03/2014