Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/26/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/30/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/09/2014