Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 04/04/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/07/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/07/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/28/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/30/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/30/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/11/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/31/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 11/18/2014