There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Expatriate Health Coverage Clarification Act of 2014

Short Titles as Introduced

Expatriate Health Coverage Clarification Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To clarify the treatment under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act of health plans in which expatriates are the primary enrollees, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
04/29/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 268 - 150 (Roll no. 182).(text: CR H3266-3267)
04/09/2014Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 257 - 159 (Roll no. 174).
04/07/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/30/2014SenateReceived in the Senate.
04/29/2014-3:45pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/29/2014-3:45pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 268 - 150 (Roll no. 182). (text: CR H3266-3267)
04/29/2014-3:14pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H3274)
04/29/2014-2:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4414.
04/29/2014-2:28pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 4414 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The resolution provides that the amendment printed in Report No. 113-422 shall be considered as adopted.
04/29/2014-2:27pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 555. (consideration: CR H3266-3275)
04/29/2014-2:26pmHouseRule H. Res. 555 passed House.
04/28/2014-6:37pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 555 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4414 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The resolution provides that the amendment printed in Report No. 113-422 shall be considered as adopted.
04/09/2014-5:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 257 - 159 (Roll no. 174).
04/09/2014-5:46pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3123-3124)
04/09/2014-1:02pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/09/2014-12:34pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4414.
04/09/2014-12:34pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3067-3072; text of measure as introduced: CR H3067)
04/09/2014-12:34pmHouseMr. Nunes moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/08/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/07/2014HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and the Workforce, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/07/2014HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and the Workforce, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/07/2014HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and the Workforce, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/07/2014HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and the Workforce, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/07/2014HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and the Workforce, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/07/2014HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and the Workforce, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/07/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (24)


Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/07/2014 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce04/07/2014 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce04/07/2014 Referred to
House Judiciary04/07/2014 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security04/08/2014 Referred to
House Natural Resources04/07/2014 Referred to
Committee on House Administration04/07/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4414. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (04/29/2014)

Expatriate Health Coverage Clarification Act of 2014 - Exempts expatriate health plans, employers acting as sponsors of such plans, and health insurance issuers providing coverage under such plans from the health care coverage requirements of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010.

Deems expatriate health coverage to be minimum essential coverage for purposes of meeting the individual responsibility requirements of the Internal Revenue Code.

Declares that a qualified expatriate (and any dependent) enrolled in an expatriate health plan shall not be considered a U.S. health risk for purposes of assessing the annual fee on health insurance providers that provide health coverage to any U.S. health risk for any year after 2014.

Establishes a special rule for calculating the amount of this fee for calendar 2014.

Defines a "qualified expatriate" as: (1) a participant in a group health plan who is an alien residing outside the United States, a U.S. national, a lawful permanent resident, or a nonimmigrant about whom there is a good faith expectation of being abroad, in connection with his or her employment, for at least 180 days in a 12-month period; or (2) an individual who is abroad as a member of a group determined appropriate by the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS).