Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/07/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/08/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/08/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/08/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/26/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/03/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/09/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 11/13/2014