Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/07/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 05/19/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 05/20/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/21/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/16/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/09/2014