Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 04/08/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/08/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/08/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/08/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/08/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/08/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 04/08/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 04/08/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 04/08/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/08/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/08/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 04/08/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/08/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/08/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 04/08/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 04/08/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/08/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/28/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/06/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/06/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/06/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/08/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 05/22/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/30/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/30/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/09/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/15/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/17/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/18/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/23/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/30/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/30/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 07/31/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/31/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/08/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/16/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/19/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/20/2014