There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Safe and Accurate Food Labeling Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act with respect to food produced from, containing, or consisting of a bioengineered organism, the labeling of natural foods, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/09/2014 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/11/2014 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
04/09/2014 Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/09/2014 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/09/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 04/09/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/09/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/09/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 06/24/2014
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 06/24/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 06/24/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/24/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/24/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/24/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/24/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 06/24/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/24/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/24/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/24/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/24/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/24/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/24/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 06/24/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/24/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/24/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/25/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/26/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/26/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/09/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 07/17/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/23/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/23/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/23/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 08/01/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/10/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/10/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/17/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/17/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/18/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/09/2014 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/11/2014 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.4432.

Subjects (11)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Agricultural practices and innovations
  • Business records
  • Department of Health and Human Services
  • Federal preemption
  • Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
  • Food supply, safety, and labeling
  • Fruit and vegetables
  • Genetics
  • Marketing and advertising

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4432. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/09/2014)

Safe and Accurate Food Labeling Act of 2014 - Amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to establish premarket notification requirements for a bioengineered organism intended for a food use or application. Defines “bioengineered organism” to mean a plant or any part of a plant which contains genetic material that has been modified through in vitro recombinant deoxyribonucleic acid (DNA) techniques when such modification could not otherwise be obtained using conventional breeding techniques.

Sets forth exceptions if: (1) the bioengineered organism is used for development or testing conducted to generate data and information that could be used in a premarket biotechnology notification or other regulatory submission; (2) a processing aid or enzyme produced from the bioengineered organism is intended to be used to produce food; or (3) food produced from, containing, or consisting of the bioengineered organism is intended to be fed to an animal from which food is intended to be produced or derived.

Directs the developer of a bioengineered organism to submit a premarket biotechnology notification to the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) at least 210 days before the organism is first introduced into interstate commerce for a food use or application. Requires such notification to include: (1) the basis for the determination that food produced from, containing, or consisting of that bioengineered organism is as safe for use by humans or animals as comparable marketed foods without the bioengineered organism, and (2) whether any other federal agency is conducting or has conducted any review of the bioengineered organism and the status or conclusions of any such review. Requires the Secretary to determine whether such food is as safe as food made without the bioengineered organism. Requires public disclosure of the premarket notification.

Authorizes the Secretary to require the label of such food to disclose a material difference between food produced from, containing, or consisting of a bioengineered organism and its comparable marketed food, as necessary to protect health and safety or to prevent the label or labeling of such food from being false or misleading.

Makes these requirements applicable 30 days after enactment of this Act, regardless of whether relevant regulations or guidance have been finalized or issued.

Preempts any state or local requirement respecting a bioengineered organism intended for a food use or application, or food produced from, containing, or consisting of a bioengineered organism.

Sets forth standards for any food label that contains claims that bioengineering was or was not used in the production of the food. Preempts any state and local labeling requirements with respect to bioengineered food.

Requires the Secretary to issue regulations setting standards for a natural claim on food labels. Preempts any state or local regulations that are not identical to the requirements of this Act.