Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/09/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 04/09/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/09/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/09/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 06/24/2014
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 06/24/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 06/24/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/24/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/24/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/24/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/24/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 06/24/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/24/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/24/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/24/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/24/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/24/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/24/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 06/24/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/24/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/24/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/25/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/26/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/26/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/09/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 07/17/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/23/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/23/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/23/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 08/01/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/10/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/10/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/17/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/17/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/18/2014