Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 04/09/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/09/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/01/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/09/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/31/2014