Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/09/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/30/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 04/30/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/30/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/30/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/30/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/30/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/30/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/07/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/07/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/07/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/08/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/08/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/08/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/29/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/29/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/25/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/30/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/30/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/11/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/11/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/11/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/24/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/24/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/24/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/24/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/28/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/28/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/28/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/31/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/31/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/01/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/09/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/09/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/09/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/09/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/09/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 09/18/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/18/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/18/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/18/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/19/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/01/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 12/01/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/01/2014