Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/28/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/18/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/11/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/12/2014