There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Dignified Interment of Our Veterans Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to conduct a study on matters relating to the claiming and interring of unclaimed remains of veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/10/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/05/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/10/2014Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2014Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/29/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/30/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/30/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/19/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/09/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/11/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/12/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/17/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/17/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/18/2014
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 07/09/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/09/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/10/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/10/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/14/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 07/22/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/22/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/24/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/28/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/29/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/29/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/08/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 09/08/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/08/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/18/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/18/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/18/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 11/12/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 11/12/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/12/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/10/2014 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs05/05/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4446. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/10/2014)

Dignified Interment of Our Veterans Act of 2014 - Requires the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to conduct a study on matters relating to the identification, claiming, and interring of unclaimed remains of veterans, including: (1) estimating the number of unclaimed remains; (2) assessing the effectiveness of VA procedures for claiming and interring unclaimed remains of veterans; (3) assessing state and local laws that affect the ability of the Secretary to identify, claim, and inter such remains; and (4) recommending appropriate legislative or administrative action.

.