Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/29/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/30/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/30/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/19/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/09/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/11/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/12/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/17/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/17/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/18/2014
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 07/09/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/09/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/10/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/10/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/14/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 07/22/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/22/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/24/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/28/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/29/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/29/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/08/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 09/08/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/08/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/18/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/18/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/18/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 11/12/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 11/12/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/12/2014