Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/28/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/28/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/29/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 07/10/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/10/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/11/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/15/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/16/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 07/23/2014