Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/06/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/06/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/06/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/06/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/06/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 02/13/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/13/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/13/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/13/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 02/13/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/25/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/25/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/25/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/25/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/25/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/27/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 02/27/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 02/27/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/05/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/07/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 03/14/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 03/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/17/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/05/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/23/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/17/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 02/11/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/04/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/23/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 09/15/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/17/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/18/2014