Refine your search

24 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
07/31/2014 Senate Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
Type of Action: Calendars
07/23/2014 Senate Received in the Senate.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
07/22/2014-7:01pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
07/22/2014-7:01pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 347 - 57 (Roll no. 433). (text: CR H6626-6627)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
07/22/2014-6:32pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6631-6632)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
07/22/2014-6:19pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
07/22/2014-5:42pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4450.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
07/22/2014-5:42pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6626-6631)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
07/22/2014-5:42pm House Mr. Terry moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
07/22/2014 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 408.
Type of Action: Calendars
07/22/2014 House Committee on Homeland Security discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Discharge
07/22/2014 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-542, Part I.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
07/15/2014 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
07/15/2014 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
07/14/2014 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
07/10/2014 House Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 0 .
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade
07/10/2014 House Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade
07/09/2014 House Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade
04/21/2014 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Homeland Security
04/11/2014 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
04/10/2014 House Referred to House Homeland Security
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
04/10/2014 House Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
04/10/2014 House Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
04/10/2014 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral