Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/10/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 04/10/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/28/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/28/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/28/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/28/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/29/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/29/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 04/29/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/29/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/01/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/01/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/01/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/01/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/01/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/06/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/07/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/08/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/08/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 05/08/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/09/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/15/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/15/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/15/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/19/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/20/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/20/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/22/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/22/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/22/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/22/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 05/22/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 05/28/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/28/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/30/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/30/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/05/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/05/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/05/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/05/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/09/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 06/09/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/10/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/10/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/10/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/10/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/11/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/12/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/17/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 06/17/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/17/2014
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 06/17/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/18/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/18/2014
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 06/18/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/18/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/18/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/18/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/18/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/18/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/18/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/18/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/18/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/18/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/19/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/19/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/20/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/20/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/24/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/24/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/25/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/26/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/26/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/26/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/03/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/03/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/03/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/03/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/03/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/03/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/03/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 07/07/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/08/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 07/08/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/08/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 07/08/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/10/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/10/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/10/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 07/11/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/15/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/15/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/15/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/15/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/16/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/17/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 07/22/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/22/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/22/2014