Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 02/01/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 02/01/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 02/01/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/01/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/01/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 02/01/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/06/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/06/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/14/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 02/14/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/14/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/26/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 02/26/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 03/11/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/11/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/11/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/11/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/11/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/11/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/12/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 03/13/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 03/13/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 04/10/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/10/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/27/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/05/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/21/2014