There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Responsibility in Federal Contracting Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require that the prevailing wage utilized for purposes of subchapter IV of chapter 31 of title 40, United States Code (commonly referred to as the Davis-Bacon Act), be determined by the Bureau of Labor Statistics.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/01/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/23/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
02/01/2013Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/01/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/24/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce02/01/2013 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections04/23/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.448.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.448. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/01/2013)

Responsibility in Federal Contracting Act - Requires that the locally prevailing wage paid to various classes of laborers and mechanics working under federally-financed or federally-assisted contracts for construction, alteration, and repair of public buildings or public works (Davis-Bacon Act) be determined by the Secretary of Labor (as under current law), but acting through the Bureau of Labor Statistics (BLS), using surveys carried out by BLS that use proper random statistical sampling techniques.