Text: H.R.45 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (05/22/2013)

Calendar No. 78

113th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 45


To repeal the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and health care-related provisions in the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

May 20, 2013

Received

May 21, 2013

Read the first time

May 22, 2013

Read the second time and placed on the calendar


AN ACT

To repeal the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and health care-related provisions in the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Repeal of PPACA and health care-related provisions in the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010.

(a) PPACA.—Effective as of the enactment of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (Public Law 111–148), such Act is repealed, and the provisions of law amended or repealed by such Act are restored or revived as if such Act had not been enacted.

(b) Health care-Related provisions in the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010.—Effective as of the enactment of the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010 (Public Law 111–152), title I and subtitle B of title II of such Act are repealed, and the provisions of law amended or repealed by such title or subtitle, respectively, are restored or revived as if such title and subtitle had not been enacted.

SEC. 2. Budgetary effects of this Act.

The budgetary effects of this Act, for the purpose of complying with the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010, shall be determined by reference to the latest statement titled “Budgetary Effects of PAYGO Legislation” for this Act, submitted for printing in the Congressional Record by the Chairman of the Committee on the Budget of the House of Representatives, as long as such statement has been submitted prior to the vote on passage of this Act.

Passed the House of Representatives May 16, 2013.

Attest:
Karen L. Haas,

Clerk  


Calendar No. 78

113th CONGRESS
     1st Session
H. R. 45

AN ACT
To repeal the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and health care-related provisions in the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010.

May 22, 2013
Read the second time and placed on the calendar