Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 04/28/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/28/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/01/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/01/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/20/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 06/20/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/20/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/26/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/14/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/30/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/10/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/10/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/10/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/11/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/13/2014