Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/29/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/20/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/20/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/20/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/22/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/22/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/26/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 11/20/2014