Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/29/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/29/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/29/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 04/29/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/29/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/29/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/29/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 04/29/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/29/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/29/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/29/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/30/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/30/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/30/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/06/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/06/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 05/06/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/06/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/19/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/19/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/19/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/21/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/21/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/20/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/16/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/23/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/18/2014