There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Gun Trafficking Prevention Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prevent gun trafficking.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/04/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/28/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/04/2013Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (118)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/26/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/26/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/26/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 02/26/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/26/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/26/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/26/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/26/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/26/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/26/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/26/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/26/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/26/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 02/26/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/26/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/26/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/26/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/26/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/26/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/26/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 02/26/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 02/26/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/26/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/04/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 03/04/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 03/04/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/04/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/04/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/12/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/12/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/14/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/14/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/19/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/19/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/19/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/19/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 03/19/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/19/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/19/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 03/21/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 03/21/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/21/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 03/21/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/21/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 03/21/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 03/21/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 03/21/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/21/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/21/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 03/21/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/21/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 03/21/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/21/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 03/21/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 03/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/25/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/25/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/25/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 03/25/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/25/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/25/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/12/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/12/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/12/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/12/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/17/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/17/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/17/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/17/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/17/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/11/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/04/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations02/28/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.452. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/04/2013)

Gun Trafficking Prevention Act of 2013 - Amends the federal criminal code to prohibit any person, in or affecting interstate commerce: (1) from purchasing, attempting to purchase, or transferring a firearm, with intent to deliver the firearm to another person who the transferor knows or has reasonable cause to believe is prohibited from possessing a firearm; (2) in purchasing, attempting to purchase, or transferring a firearm, from intentionally providing false or misleading material information on a Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives (ATF) firearms transaction record form; or (3) knowingly directing, promoting, or facilitating such a violation. Authorizes an enhanced penalty for the organization or supervision of such conduct.

Makes exceptions for a firearm that is lawfully acquired: (1) to be given to another person not prohibited from possessing it under federal or state law as a gift; or (2) by a court-appointed trustee, receiver, or conservator on behalf of an estate or creditor, to carry out a bequest, or in an acquisition by intestate succession.

Directs the U.S. Sentencing Commission to review and, if appropriate, amend the federal sentencing guidelines and policy statements applicable to persons convicted of offenses under this Act.