Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/26/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/26/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/26/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 02/26/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/26/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/26/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/26/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/26/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/26/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/26/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/26/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/26/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/26/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 02/26/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/26/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/26/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/26/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/26/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/26/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/26/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 02/26/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 02/26/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/26/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/04/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 03/04/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 03/04/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/04/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/04/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/12/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/12/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/14/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/14/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/19/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/19/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/19/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/19/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 03/19/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/19/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/19/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 03/21/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 03/21/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/21/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 03/21/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/21/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 03/21/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 03/21/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 03/21/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/21/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/21/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 03/21/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/21/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 03/21/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/21/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 03/21/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 03/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/25/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/25/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/25/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 03/25/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/25/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/25/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/12/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/12/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/12/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/12/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/17/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/17/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/17/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/17/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/17/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/11/2013