Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/20/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/20/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/28/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/28/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/28/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/12/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/10/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/17/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/30/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/30/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/30/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 07/30/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/30/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/09/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 09/09/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/09/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 09/09/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/09/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/09/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/18/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/14/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 11/18/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/11/2014