Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/21/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/30/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/30/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/30/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/30/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/12/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/26/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 09/11/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/17/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/18/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/18/2014