Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 04/30/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/06/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/06/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/07/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/07/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/07/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/07/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/07/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/07/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/07/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 05/07/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/07/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/07/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/07/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/07/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/07/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/07/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/08/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/13/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/13/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/13/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/13/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 05/28/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/28/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/29/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/30/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 06/18/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/17/2014