Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/14/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/14/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/28/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/04/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/04/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 03/04/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/04/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/11/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/11/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/13/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/09/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/09/2013