Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/01/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/01/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 05/01/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/01/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/02/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/19/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/20/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/22/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 11/12/2014