There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

International Megan's Law to Prevent Demand for Child Sex Trafficking

Short Titles as Introduced

International Megan's Law to Prevent Demand for Child Sex Trafficking

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

International Megan's Law to Prevent Demand for Child Sex Trafficking

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect children from exploitation, especially sex trafficking in tourism, by providing advance notice of intended travel by registered child-sex offenders outside the United States to the government of the country of destination, requesting foreign governments to notify the United States when a known child-sex offender is seeking to enter the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/11/2014Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment. Without written report.
05/20/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4529-4531)
05/06/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
12/11/2014SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 645.
12/11/2014SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Relations
12/11/2014SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Relations
12/11/2014SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
07/21/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/21/2014SenateReceived in the Senate.
05/20/2014-5:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4529-4531)
05/20/2014-5:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4573.
05/20/2014-5:33pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4529-4534)
05/20/2014-5:33pmHouseMr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/09/2014HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/09/2014HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/06/2014HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/06/2014HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/06/2014HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/06/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs05/06/2014 Referred to
05/09/2014 Markup by
House Judiciary05/06/2014 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations07/21/2014 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations12/11/2014 Referred to
12/11/2014 Markup by
12/11/2014 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4573.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4573. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (12/11/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on May 20, 2014. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

International Megan's Law to Prevent Demand for Child Sex Trafficking - (Sec. 4) Directs the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to establish within the Child Exploitation Investigations Unit of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE) the Angel Watch Center, which shall: (1) receive information on travel by child-sex offenders; (2) establish a system to maintain and archive all relevant information, including decisions not to transmit notification abroad and responses of destination countries to notifications; (3) establish an annual review process to ensure that the Center is consistent in procedures regarding providing notification to destination countries; and (4) establish a mechanism to receive complaints from child-sex offenders affected by notifications of destination countries.

Authorizes the Center to transmit notice to a destination country (including to such country's visa-issuing agents in the United States) of impending or current international travel of a child-sex offender to such country. Requires the Secretary, in conjunction with any appropriate agency, if the Center transmits such notice to a destination country, to make reasonable efforts to provide constructive notice through electronic or telephonic communication to the child-sex offender prior to such offender's arrival in such country, except when such constructive notice would conflict with an existing investigation involving the offender. Requires the Center to make reasonable efforts to provide constructive notice to such offender if the Center has reason to believe that transmitting notice to a destination country: (1) poses a risk to the life or well-being of the offender, or (2) is highly likely to result in the destination country denying entry to the offender. Terminates the authority of the Center to transmit such notice of international travel of a child-sex offender as of the close of the last day of the registration period of such offender under the Adam Walsh Child Protection and Safety Act of 2006 (Walsh Act).

Directs the Center to establish a mechanism to receive complaints from child-sex offenders affected by notifications of destination countries.

Requires the Center to engage in ongoing consultations with: (1) nongovernmental organizations that have experience in identifying and preventing child sex tourism and rescuing and rehabilitating minor victims of international sexual exploitation and trafficking, (2) the governments of countries interested in cooperating in the creation of an international sex offender travel notification system or that are primary destination or source countries for international sex tourism, and (3) Internet service and software providers regarding technology to facilitate the implementation of an international sex offender travel notification system in the United States and in other countries.

Authorizes the Secretary of Homeland Security and the Secretary of State to provide technical assistance to enable foreign authorities to participate more effectively in the notification program system.

(Sec. 5) Expresses the sense of Congress that the President should: (1) negotiate bilateral agreements with foreign governments to further the purposes of this Act; and (2) formally request foreign governments to notify the United States when a U.S. citizen has been arrested, convicted, or sentenced or has completed a prison sentence for a child-sex offense in the foreign country.

(Sec. 6) Amends the Trafficking Victims Protection Act of 2000 to include, as indicia of serious and sustained efforts to eliminate severe forms of trafficking in persons, a country's cooperation with other governments in the investigation and prosecution of such trafficking, including trafficking related to sex tourism.

(Sec. 7) Encourages the President to use authorities under the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to assist foreign countries in identifying sex offenders and providing and receiving notification of child sex offender international travel.