Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/28/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/28/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/28/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/28/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/28/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/28/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/28/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/28/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/28/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/28/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/28/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 05/28/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/28/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 05/28/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/28/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/28/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/28/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/28/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/28/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/28/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/28/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/28/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/28/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/28/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/28/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/28/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/28/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/29/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/29/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 05/29/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/09/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/09/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/09/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/09/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/10/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/17/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/10/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/10/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/16/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/24/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/29/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 07/31/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/09/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/15/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/18/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/04/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 12/04/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/04/2014