Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/19/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/19/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/12/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/17/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/22/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/23/2014