Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 05/09/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/19/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/19/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 05/21/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/21/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/21/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/22/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/29/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/29/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/29/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/30/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/09/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/09/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/11/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/12/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 06/17/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/18/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/18/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 06/18/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/20/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/20/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/20/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/24/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 06/24/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/26/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/08/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/08/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/08/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/14/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/14/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/14/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/16/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/16/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/22/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/23/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/23/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/25/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/25/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/28/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/29/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/29/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/29/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/30/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/08/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 09/08/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/08/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/08/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/09/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/09/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/10/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 09/10/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/10/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/15/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/15/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/15/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/15/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 09/18/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 11/12/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 11/12/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 11/12/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 11/12/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/19/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/11/2014