Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 05/21/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/29/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/24/2014