Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/08/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/15/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/12/2014