Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/19/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/21/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/29/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/09/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/09/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 06/17/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/20/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/20/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/24/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/08/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/14/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/14/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/16/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/23/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/25/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/28/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/29/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/29/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/29/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/30/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/08/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/08/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/08/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 09/10/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/10/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/15/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 11/12/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 11/12/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/11/2014