Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 05/06/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/07/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/07/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/07/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/08/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/08/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/09/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/19/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/19/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/19/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/19/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/19/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 05/28/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/09/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/09/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/09/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/09/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/09/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/09/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 06/11/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/11/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/11/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/11/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/11/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/11/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/12/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/12/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/17/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/17/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/17/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 06/17/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/17/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/20/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/20/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/20/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/20/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/20/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/20/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/20/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/20/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/20/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/24/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/24/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/24/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/24/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/24/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/26/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/26/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/26/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/26/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/26/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/26/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/26/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/26/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/26/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/09/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/09/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/09/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/09/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/09/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/15/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/16/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/23/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/23/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/23/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/25/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 08/01/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/09/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/09/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/16/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 11/12/2014