Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/07/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/30/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/05/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/09/2014
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/10/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 06/17/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 06/18/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/26/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/16/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/22/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/23/2014