Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/04/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 02/13/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/13/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/04/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/04/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/04/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/04/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/12/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/12/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/15/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/19/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/19/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/09/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/09/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/11/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/12/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/07/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/20/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/23/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/05/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/06/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/25/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/09/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/09/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/10/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/17/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/01/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/10/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/10/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 09/10/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/17/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 09/17/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/02/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/03/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/04/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/09/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 10/28/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/19/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/11/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 02/27/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/04/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/06/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 03/06/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/12/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/24/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/26/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/26/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/04/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/04/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/04/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 04/04/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 04/04/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 04/07/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/10/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/29/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/29/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/29/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/07/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/07/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/07/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/07/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/09/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/09/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/09/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/09/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/20/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/20/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 05/20/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/20/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 05/28/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/28/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/28/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 05/28/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/23/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/23/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/23/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 06/23/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/23/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/23/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/14/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/14/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/25/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/15/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/18/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/18/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 11/12/2014