Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 05/08/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 05/21/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/28/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/11/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/11/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 06/11/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/11/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 06/11/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 06/11/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/12/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/12/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 06/12/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/12/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/17/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/18/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/19/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/19/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/19/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 06/20/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/24/2014
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 06/24/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/24/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/08/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/08/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/08/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/08/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/10/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/10/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 07/15/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/15/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/22/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/24/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 07/24/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/31/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/11/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/17/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/17/2014
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 11/18/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/10/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/10/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/16/2014