Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 05/09/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/21/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/21/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/21/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/21/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/21/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/21/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/21/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/22/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/29/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/29/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/09/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/09/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/09/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/11/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/11/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/18/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/18/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/18/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/11/2014