Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 06/20/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/08/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/16/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 08/01/2014