Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/09/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 05/09/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 05/09/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/13/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/13/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/13/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/13/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/13/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/15/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/15/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/15/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/20/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/20/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 05/20/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/22/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/22/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/22/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/27/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/27/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/30/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/11/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/23/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/25/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/10/2014